MA S1176 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - House concurred
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - House concurred
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to make a technical changes to the Betsy Lehman Center for Patient Safety and Medical Error Reduction enabling statute. Public Health.
Title
Making technical changes to the Betsy Lehman Center for Patient Safety and Medical Error Reduction enabling statute
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | House | House concurred |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-03-01 | House | House concurred |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 25, 2018, pending concurrence |
2017-05-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-05-15 | House | House concurred |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1211 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S1167 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied H1144
S1169 (Similar To) 2018-05-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4454
S356 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2419
S783 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H1218 (Similar To) 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
H3230 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H4112 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4113 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1167 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied H1144
S1169 (Similar To) 2018-05-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4454
S356 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2419
S783 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H1218 (Similar To) 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
H3230 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H4112 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4113 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1176 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1176.pdf |