MA S1184 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2174
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-05 - New draft substituted, see S2174
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-05 - New draft substituted, see S2174
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to amusement devices. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to amusement devices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-05 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2174 |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Read second |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a new draft, see S2174 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2013-09-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/07/2013 from 10:00 AM-12:30 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S2174 (Replaced by) 2014-06-09 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1184 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1184.pdf |