MA S1214 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Labor and Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Labor and Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to increase unemployment insurance benefits for low wage workers.. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
To increase unemployment insurance benefits for low wage workers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-07 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday April 4, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-05-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/18/2021 from 10:30 AM-03:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H90 (Similar To) 2021-04-20 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H3702
S35 (Similar To) 2021-03-18 - See H90
S1720 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1202 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S96 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2508 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2527
H2033 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Senate concurred
S2527 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4111 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H19
H1221 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5167
S1773 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1771 (Similar To) 2022-01-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1750 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H2611 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5020
H2553 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1186 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S1690 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S927 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S84 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S2411 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S967 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H3027 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
H2885 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H2836 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S35 (Similar To) 2021-03-18 - See H90
S1720 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1202 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S96 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2508 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2527
H2033 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Senate concurred
S2527 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4111 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H19
H1221 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5167
S1773 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1771 (Similar To) 2022-01-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1750 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H2611 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5020
H2553 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1186 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S1690 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S927 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S84 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S2411 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S967 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H3027 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
H2885 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H2836 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1214 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1214.pdf |