MA S1216 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-11-14 - Hearing scheduled for 11/17/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 437
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-11-14 - Hearing scheduled for 11/17/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 437
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide for HIV testing for at risk police officers. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Providing for HIV testing for at risk police officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/17/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 437 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred. |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security. |
2011-01-21 | Senate | Bill Filed. |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S1216 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=10471&generalCourtId=1 |