MA S1218 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2720
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2720
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2720
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to expand access to commuter transit benefits offered by employers. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Expanding access to commuter transit benefits offered by employers
Sponsors
Sen. John Keenan [D] | Rep. Jack Lewis [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] |
Rep. Bradley Jones [R] | Sen. Susan Moran [D] | Sen. Walter Timilty [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2720 |
2021-06-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2021 from 10:30 AM-04:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H90 (Similar To) 2021-04-20 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H3702
S35 (Similar To) 2021-03-18 - See H90
S1183 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4614
S1154 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4614
H133 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
H2036 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2720
H2863 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S1244 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S1204 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2720 (Replaced by) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S35 (Similar To) 2021-03-18 - See H90
S1183 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4614
S1154 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4614
H133 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
H2036 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2720
H2863 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S1244 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S1204 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2720 (Replaced by) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1218 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1218.pdf |