MA S1223 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prohibit the confiscation of lawfully owned firearms during a state of emergency
Title
Prohibiting the confiscation of lawfully owned firearms during a state of emergency
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2011-05-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/12/2011 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred. |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security. |
2011-01-21 | Senate | Bill Filed. |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S1223 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=14275&generalCourtId=1 |