MA S123 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-12 - Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-12 - Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to protect consumers from unsolicited loans. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Protecting consumers from unsolicited loans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S127 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H344 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
H2212 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1728 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H503 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H185 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H2200 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H35 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4785
S2336 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - New draft substituted, see S2610
S2357 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H344 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
H2212 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1728 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H503 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H185 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H2200 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H35 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4785
S2336 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - New draft substituted, see S2610
S2357 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S123 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S123.pdf |