MA S1243 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2439
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2439
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2439
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the enhancement and improvement of the Commonwealth’s laws relating to fire prevention
Title
Relative to the enhancement and improvement of the Commonwealth’s laws relating to fire prevention.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-20 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2439 |
2011-10-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/11/2011 from 12:00 AM-05:00 AM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred. |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security. |
2011-01-19 | Senate | Bill Filed. |
Same As/Similar To
S2439 (Replaced by) 2012-09-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S1243 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=10951&generalCourtId=1 |