MA S125 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2202
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2202
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2202
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to mobile spas. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to mobile spas
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-03 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2202 |
2011-05-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/03/2011 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred. |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. |
Same As/Similar To
S2202 (Replaced by) 2012-04-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S125 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=8173&generalCourtId=1 |