MA S1250 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2343
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-31 - New draft substituted, see S2343
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-31 - New draft substituted, see S2343
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to disability pension benefits and earnings. Public Service.
Title
Relative to disability pension benefits and earnings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-31 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2343 |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Read second |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see S2343 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2014-02-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/10/2013 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S2343 (Replaced by) 2015-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 492 of the Acts of 2014
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1250 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1250.pdf |