MA S1276 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2443
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2443
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2443
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide that the teachers retirement board include certain compensation in determining retirement for Ann Meeropol
Title
Providing that the teachers' retirement board include certain compensation in determining a certain person.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-27 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2443 |
2011-10-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/08/2011 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred. |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Service. |
2011-01-18 | Senate | Bill Filed. |
Same As/Similar To
S2443 (Replaced by) 2012-10-01 - Discharged to the Senate committee on Ethics and Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S1276 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=9370&generalCourtId=1 |