MA S128 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-11 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-11 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to improve access to treatment for individuals with perinatal substance use disorder. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Resolve relative to improving access to treatment for individuals with perinatal substance use disorder
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Lovely [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-11 | Senate | Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Recommitted to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2022-01-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/18/2022 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S1001 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H4017 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
S2044 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S673 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
H4017 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
S2044 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S673 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S128 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S128.pdf |