MA S1290 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S1853
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-08-26 - Accompanied S1853
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-08-26 - Accompanied S1853
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Matthew Stuart, an employee of the Department of Children and Families. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Matthew Stuart, an employee of the Department of Children and Families.
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] | Rep. James Miceli [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-26 | Senate | Accompanied S1853 |
2013-08-22 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S1853 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1853 (Replaced by) 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1290 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1290.pdf |