MA S1304 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2647
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2647
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2647
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide for reserve funds for school districts. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Providing for reserve funds for school districts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2647 |
2023-10-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2023 from 01:30 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H2075 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2076 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2647 (Replaced by) 2024-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H2076 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2647 (Replaced by) 2024-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1304 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1304.pdf |