MA S1308 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5225
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a special commission to study the prevention of heroin trafficking. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.
Title
Establishing a special commission to study the prevention of heroin trafficking
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-22 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5225 |
2021-09-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
H1734 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1093 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1024 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S576 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1561 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2762
S221 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H5225 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H609 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1093 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1024 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S576 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1561 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2762
S221 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H5225 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H609 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1308 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1308.pdf |