MA S1324 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2443
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2443
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2443
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative retiree and employee health care premiums in the city of Brockton
Title
Relative to the City of Brockton's contribution to the health insurance premium of its retirees and employees’ and to the schedules of benefits for health insurance plans offered by the city.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-27 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2443 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred. |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Service. |
2011-01-20 | Senate | Bill Filed. |
Same As/Similar To
S2443 (Replaced by) 2012-10-01 - Discharged to the Senate committee on Ethics and Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S1324 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=13032&generalCourtId=1 |