MA S133 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4677
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4677
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4677
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish the Office of Massachusetts Main Streets. Community Development and Small Businesses.
Title
Establishing the Office of Massachusetts Main Streets
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-28 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4677 |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-05-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 22, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 1, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-10-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/30/2023 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Community Development and Small Businesses |
Same As/Similar To
S2619 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - New draft substituted, see S2697
H4424 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4428 (Similar To) 2024-03-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2579 (Similar To) 2024-02-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4677 (Replaced by) 2024-05-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4424 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4428 (Similar To) 2024-03-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2579 (Similar To) 2024-02-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4677 (Replaced by) 2024-05-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S133 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S133.pdf |