MA S1332 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2314
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to define veteran for public retirees. Public Service.
Title
Relative to the definition of veteran for public retirees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2314 |
2015-06-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/23/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S2314 (Replaced by) 2016-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1419 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1406 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1997 (Similar To) 2016-01-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2113
S2113 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1395 (Similar To) 2016-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1419 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1406 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1997 (Similar To) 2016-01-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2113
S2113 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1395 (Similar To) 2016-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1332 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1332.pdf |