MA S1333 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-19 - Committee recommended ought NOT to pass and referred to the committe on Senate Ethics and Rules
Pending: Senate Ethics and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-19 - Committee recommended ought NOT to pass and referred to the committe on Senate Ethics and Rules
Pending: Senate Ethics and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to adjust disability retirement benefits to Lynn police officer Gregory LeBlanc. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to adjustment of disability retirement benefits to Lynn police officer Gregory LeBlanc
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-19 | Senate | Committee recommended ought NOT to pass and referred to the committe on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2011-06-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/28/2011 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S1333 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=12752&generalCourtId=1 |