MA S1337 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-11-18 - Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-11-18 - Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide further revenue to the Financial Literacy Trust Fund. Revenue.
Title
To provide further revenue to the Financial Literacy Trust Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-18 | House | Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2013-11-14 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #208 [YEAS 36 - NAYS 0] |
2013-11-14 | Senate | Read third |
2013-11-14 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-11-14 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-11-14 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2013-07-11 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2013-06-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2013 from 09:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Revenue |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1337 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1337.pdf |