MA S135 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H194
Note: Replaces legislation S198
Note: Replaces legislation S198
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to public safety and unlicensed electrical work. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to public safety and unlicensed electrical work
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-11 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Accompanied by H194 and S198 |
2015-11-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-10-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in 437 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H194 (Replaces) 2016-02-11 - Accompanied S135
S198 (Replaces) 2016-02-11 - Accompanied S135
S1434 (Similar To) 2015-11-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1279 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1437 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2445 (Similar To) 2016-07-23 - Reprinted as amended, see S2462
S2462 (Similar To) 2016-07-28 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S423 (Similar To) 2016-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1221 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1386 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1245 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1180 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2211
S835 (Similar To) 2015-10-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2028
S198 (Replaces) 2016-02-11 - Accompanied S135
S1434 (Similar To) 2015-11-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1279 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1437 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2445 (Similar To) 2016-07-23 - Reprinted as amended, see S2462
S2462 (Similar To) 2016-07-28 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S423 (Similar To) 2016-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1221 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1386 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1245 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1180 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2211
S835 (Similar To) 2015-10-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2028
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S135 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S135.pdf |