MA S1383 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4270
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4270
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4270
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prohibit non-consensual pelvic examinations. Public Health.
Title
To assure informed consent for pelvic examinations of anesthetized or unconscious patients
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-02 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4270 |
2021-05-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/07/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H1618 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H2405 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
H1595 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H2093 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
H2328 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5202
S1058 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1846
H4270 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2405 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
H1595 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H2093 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
H2328 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5202
S1058 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1846
H4270 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1383 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1383.pdf |