MA S1389 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2234
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2234
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2234
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to automated sales suppression devices. Revenue.
Title
Relative to automated sales suppression devices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-30 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2234 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-03-20 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday June 30, 2014, pending concurrence |
2013-07-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2013 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-05-13 | House | Discharged to the House Committee on The Judiciary |
2013-05-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2013 from 10:30 AM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S2234 (Replaced by) 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1389 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1389.pdf |