MA S1389 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to civil service resident preference. Public Service.
Title
Relative to civil service resident preference
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-07-16 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-07-12 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-07-11 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-07-11 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-07-11 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2017-11-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/07/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S342 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S1583 (Similar To) 2017-07-20 - Accompanied S1503
S63 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
H2077 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H337 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Accompanied S342
H626 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H366 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H3653 (Similar To) 2017-09-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3925
H2467 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H3521 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1583 (Similar To) 2017-07-20 - Accompanied S1503
S63 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
H2077 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H337 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Accompanied S342
H626 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H366 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H3653 (Similar To) 2017-09-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3925
H2467 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H3521 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1389 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1389.pdf |