MA S1397 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to modernize childhood lead poisoning prevention. Public Health.
Title
Modernizing childhood lead poisoning prevention
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Accompanied by H2410 |
2021-04-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/03/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H2410 (Similar To) 2022-01-10 - Accompanied S1397
S289 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S2516 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S791 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S334 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S1179 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4681
S1266 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2919
S289 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S2516 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S791 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S334 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S1179 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4681
S1266 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2919
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1397 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1397.pdf |