MA S1411 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to MassPort officers. Public Service.
Title
Relative to MassPort officers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-11 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2015-09-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1359 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1267 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1357 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
H2280 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2451 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4026
H2287 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2452 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
S1267 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1357 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
H2280 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2451 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4026
H2287 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2452 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1411 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1411.pdf |