MA S1421 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2487
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2487
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2487
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for the public inspection of records made or received by special state police officers at educational institutions and hospitals
Title
To provide for the public inspection of records made or received by special state police officers at educational institutions and hospitals.
Sponsors
Rep. Antonio Cabral [D] | Rep. Christine Canavan [D] | Rep. Paul Donato [D] | Rep. Kevin Honan [D] |
Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Rep. Carl Sciortino [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-18 | Accompanied a new draft, see S2487 | |
2010-04-05 | Reporting date extended to Saturday, May 15, 2010 | |
2009-01-20 | House concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the committee on Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S2487 (Replaced by) 2010-07-27 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Committee On Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/186/Senate/S1421 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=2271&generalCourtId=2 |