MA S1435 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to elevator certificates. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to elevator certificates
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Sen. Paul Feeney [D] | Rep. John Mahoney [D] | Rep. Thomas Stanley [D] |
Rep. David LeBoeuf [D] | Rep. Daniel Donahue [D] | Rep. Jack Lewis [D] | Rep. Mike Connolly [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-08 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-09-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H1826 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
H1105 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S1267 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H1892 (Similar To) 2020-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H3480 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
S875 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1440 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2101 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5117
H1105 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S1267 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H1892 (Similar To) 2020-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H3480 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
S875 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1440 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2101 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5117
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1435 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1435.pdf |