MA S1436 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-27 - Accompanied H2247
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-27 - Accompanied H2247
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to safe patient handling and mobility in certain health facilities. Public Health.
Title
Relative to safe patient handling and mobility in certain health facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-27 | House | Accompanied H2247 |
2023-06-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/06/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H2247 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1436 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1436.pdf |