MA S1442 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied H1390
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied H1390
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to protecting the rights of custodial and other non-teaching employees of school districts. Public Service.
Title
Relative to protecting the rights of custodial and other non-teaching employees of school districts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | House | Accompanied H1390 |
2017-05-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/09/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1638 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S769 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S504 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1537 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S846 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1738 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H708 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H800 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H927 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H709 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3700 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H388 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H1390 (Similar To) 2018-07-30 - Chapter 160 of the Acts of 2018
H1414 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H889 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S769 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S504 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1537 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S846 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1738 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H708 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H800 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H927 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H709 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3700 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H388 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H1390 (Similar To) 2018-07-30 - Chapter 160 of the Acts of 2018
H1414 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H889 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1442 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1442.pdf |