MA S1457 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2491
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to pension fund performance and accountability. Public Service.
Title
Relative to pension fund performance and accountability
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2491 |
2017-07-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2017 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1767 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S1778 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S70 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2345
S870 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H609 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1033 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2327
H331 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4390
H2065 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
S2254 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2491 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1778 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S70 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2345
S870 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H609 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1033 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2327
H331 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4390
H2065 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
S2254 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2491 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1457 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1457.pdf |