MA S146 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2477
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2477
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to mandate domestic violence and sexual assault awareness education for aestheticians, barbers, cosmetologists, electrologists, hairdressers, manicurists, and massage therapists. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
To mandate domestic violence and sexual assault awareness education for aestheticians, barbers, cosmetologists, electrologists, hairdressers, manicurists, and massage therapists
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-19 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2477 |
2023-06-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/12/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H249 (Similar To) 2023-10-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2477
S2477 (Similar To) 2024-07-29 - New draft substituted, see S2904
S2904 (Similar To) 2024-07-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2477 (Similar To) 2024-07-29 - New draft substituted, see S2904
S2904 (Similar To) 2024-07-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S146 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S146.pdf |