MA S1468 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H2243
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Accompanied H2243
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Accompanied H2243
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to certified medication aides. Public Health.
Title
Relative to certified medication aides
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] | Sen. Barry Finegold [D] | Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] | Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D] |
Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Sen. Ryan Fattman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | House | Accompanied H2243 |
2023-09-18 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 09/21/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-09-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/21/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S364 (Similar To) 2023-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3929
S1422 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Bill recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H637 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2604
H2243 (Replaced by) 2024-07-11 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2604 (Similar To) 2024-07-22 - Accompanied H4193
S1422 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Bill recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H637 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2604
H2243 (Replaced by) 2024-07-11 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2604 (Similar To) 2024-07-22 - Accompanied H4193
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1468 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1468.pdf |