MA S147 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2161
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-09-29 - New draft substituted, see S2161
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-09-29 - New draft substituted, see S2161
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to convert one seasonal license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be consumed on the premises to one annual license in the city of Westfield
Title
Relative to converting one seasonal license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be consumed on the premises to one annual license .
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-09-29 | New draft substituted, see S2161 | |
2009-09-29 | Read third | |
2009-09-29 | Taken out of the Orders of the Day | |
2009-09-23 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | |
2009-09-21 | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | |
2009-01-20 | House concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the committee on Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S2161 (Replaced by) 2009-11-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 129 of the Acts of 2009
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/186/Senate/S147 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=1214&generalCourtId=2 |