MA S148 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2534
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to enhance, update and protect the 2013 Motor Vehicle Right to Repair Law and Consumer Rights. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
To enhance, update and protect the 2013 Motor Vehicle Right to Repair Law and Consumer Rights
Sponsors
Sen. Barry Finegold [D] | Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] | Sen. Julian Cyr [D] |
Rep. David Robertson [D] | Sen. Nick Collins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2534 |
2020-01-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/13/2020 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H2978 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H246 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S133 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
S107 (Similar To) 2020-04-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3125 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S2094 (Similar To) 2020-05-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2124 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H275 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H4249 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5037
S2534 (Replaced by) 2020-02-18 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H246 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S133 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
S107 (Similar To) 2020-04-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3125 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S2094 (Similar To) 2020-05-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2124 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H275 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H4249 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5037
S2534 (Replaced by) 2020-02-18 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S148 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S148.pdf |