MA S149 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H164
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to update reciprocity for licensing optometrists. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to updating reciprocity for licensing optometrists
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-04 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Accompanied by H164 |
2015-11-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-10-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in 437 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H164 (Replaces) 2016-02-04 - Accompanied S149
S98 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
S435 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
H191 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
S515 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
H1987 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
S98 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
S435 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
H191 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
S515 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
H1987 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S149 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S149.pdf |