MA S1505 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to fire safety education in schools and colleges. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to fire safety education in schools and colleges
Sponsors
Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] | Sen. Michael Barrett [D] | Sen. Jacob Oliveira [D] | Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D] |
Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2024-04-25 | House | House concurred |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-04-04 | House | House concurred |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Monday April 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-06-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/07/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H2313 (Similar To) 2024-05-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1254 (Similar To) 2024-03-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S834 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2677
H1254 (Similar To) 2024-03-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S834 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2677
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1505 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1505.pdf |