MA S1507 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to public safety around hospitals with air emergency helipads. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to public safety around hospitals with air emergency helipads
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2024-04-25 | House | House concurred |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-04-04 | House | House concurred |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Monday April 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-09-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/04/2023 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H2400 (Similar To) 2024-07-03 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4878 (Similar To) 2024-07-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4877 (Similar To) 2024-08-15 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4904 (Similar To) 2024-08-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4906 (Similar To) 2024-08-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4878 (Similar To) 2024-07-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4877 (Similar To) 2024-08-15 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4904 (Similar To) 2024-08-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4906 (Similar To) 2024-08-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1507 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1507.pdf |