MA S152 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2467
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2467
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2467
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to expand the sale of products by farmer distilleries and wineries. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Expanding the sale of products by farmer distilleries and wineries
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-16 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2467 |
2019-06-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H2601 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2630 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S481 (Similar To) 2019-07-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H871 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2467 (Replaced by) 2020-03-12 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefore a new draft, see S2596 and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2630 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S481 (Similar To) 2019-07-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H871 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2467 (Replaced by) 2020-03-12 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefore a new draft, see S2596 and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S152 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S152.pdf |