MA S1523 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H2321
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2321
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2321
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to protecting local retirees. Public Service.
Title
Relative to protecting local retirees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Accompanied H2321 |
2019-07-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2323 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S2177 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1532 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1027 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S743 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
S597 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H2189 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S497 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
S707 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2227 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H2321 (Replaced by) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S2177 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1532 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1027 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S743 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
S597 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H2189 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S497 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
S707 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2227 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H2321 (Replaced by) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1523 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1523.pdf |