MA S1546 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3639
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3639
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3639
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to clarify the net-worth measure of the corporate excise. Revenue.
Title
To clarify the net-worth measure of the corporate excise
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3639 |
2015-06-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/09/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H3639 (Replaced by) 2015-07-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1591 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1437 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1543 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S750 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1564 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1565 (Similar To) 2015-07-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3639
S1591 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1437 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1543 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S750 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1564 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1565 (Similar To) 2015-07-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3639
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1546 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1546.pdf |