MA S1547 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2876
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2876
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2876
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to parole review for aging incarcerated people. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to parole review for aging incarcerated people
Sponsors
Sen. Liz Miranda [D] | Rep. Jack Lewis [D] | Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D] | Rep. Mike Connolly [D] |
Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Sen. Joanne Comerford [D] | Sen. Adam Gomez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-19 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2876 |
2024-07-17 | House | House concurred |
2024-07-15 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday, July 17th, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-04-25 | House | House concurred |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-04-04 | House | House concurred |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Monday April 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-01-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/23/2024 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H2397 (Similar To) 2024-06-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4391 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4643 (Similar To) 2024-05-16 - Published as amended, see H4653
H4653 (Similar To) 2024-07-24 - Committee of conference appointed (Friedman-Cronin-Tarr), in concurrence
H4819 (Similar To) 2024-07-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2876 (Replaced by) 2024-07-19 - Order reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
H4391 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4643 (Similar To) 2024-05-16 - Published as amended, see H4653
H4653 (Similar To) 2024-07-24 - Committee of conference appointed (Friedman-Cronin-Tarr), in concurrence
H4819 (Similar To) 2024-07-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2876 (Replaced by) 2024-07-19 - Order reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1547 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1547.pdf |