MA S1574 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2024
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to affordable housing energy efficiency. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to affordable housing energy efficiency
Sponsors
Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] | Rep. Timothy Toomey [D] | Sen. Daniel Wolf [D] | Sen. Marc Pacheco [D] |
Sen. Linda Forry [D] | Rep. Denise Provost [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Rep. Benjamin Swan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2024 |
2013-07-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2013 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S2024 (Replaced by) 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1574 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1574.pdf |