MA S1576 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2545
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the cost of living adjustment for public retirees. Public Service.
Title
Relative to the cost of living adjustment for public retirees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2545 |
2019-09-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2232 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1551 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H67 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
S1578 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H1070 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H2203 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2158 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1487 (Similar To) 2020-07-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2798
S1503 (Similar To) 2019-10-24 - Accompanied H2346
S1533 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2952 (Similar To) 2019-11-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2230 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 12 of the Acts of 2020
S2363 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2545 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Reported (in part) by S1477
S1551 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H67 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
S1578 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H1070 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H2203 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2158 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1487 (Similar To) 2020-07-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2798
S1503 (Similar To) 2019-10-24 - Accompanied H2346
S1533 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2952 (Similar To) 2019-11-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2230 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 12 of the Acts of 2020
S2363 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2545 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Reported (in part) by S1477
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1576 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1576.pdf |