MA S158 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2357
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to regulate the sale and use of microwave ovens. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
To regulate the sale and use of microwave ovens
Sponsors
Sen. John Keenan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-23 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2357 |
2016-01-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/26/2016 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S2357 (Replaced by) 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S113 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2145
H2762 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2609 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2683 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
S113 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2145
H2762 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2609 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2683 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S158 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S158.pdf |