MA S158 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-02 - Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-02 - Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prevent discrimination on certain boards of registration. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to preventing discrimination on certain boards of registration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S113 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S210 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2428
S1023 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3659
S1685 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S986 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2490
S1719 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H1038 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3659
H1685 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4589
H775 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H952 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H2317 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S210 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2428
S1023 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3659
S1685 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S986 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2490
S1719 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H1038 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3659
H1685 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4589
H775 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H952 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H2317 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S158 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S158.pdf |