MA S1586 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2025
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2025
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2025
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further promote energy efficiency and green jobs. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Further promoting energy efficiency and green jobs
Sponsors
Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Rep. David Rogers [D] | Rep. Denise Andrews [D] | Rep. Mary Keefe [D] |
Sen. Anne Gobi [D] | Rep. Cory Atkins [D] | Rep. Jennifer Benson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2025 |
2013-07-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2013 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S2025 (Replaced by) 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1586 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1586.pdf |