MA S1599 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to the create the Massachusetts Public Safety Building Authority. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to the creation of the Massachusetts Public Safety Building Authority
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2024-04-25 | House | House concurred |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-04-04 | House | House concurred |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Monday April 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-09-06 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 09/13/2023 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-09-06 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 09/13/2023 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1599 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1599.pdf |