MA S1609 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to enhance Department of Revenue reporting. Revenue.
Title
Enhancing Department of Revenue reporting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2017-03-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/10/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S372 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
H2098 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4320
H78 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4792
H801 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H2098 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4320
H78 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4792
H801 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1609 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1609.pdf |