MA S1623 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S1840
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-30 - New draft substituted, see S1840
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-30 - New draft substituted, see S1840
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a commission to study the feasibility of hosting the summer Olympics . Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development.
Title
Resolve to establish a commission to study the feasibility of hosting the summer Olympics
Sponsors
Sen. Eileen Donoghue [D] | Rep. Sarah Peake [D] | Rep. Colleen Garry [D] | Sen. Michael Knapik [R] |
Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-30 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S1840 |
2013-07-30 | Senate | Read second |
2013-07-30 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-07-30 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefore a new draft, see S1840 |
2013-07-25 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Joint Rules |
2013-05-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2013 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development |
Same As/Similar To
S1840 (Replaced by) 2013-10-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Resolves of 2013
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1623 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1623.pdf |